Accounts and annual returns TILLINGHAM ST NICHOLAS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1021580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 September 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 September 2022 417 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 964 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 02 August 2019 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 September 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 06 August 2018 7 days late Download Open in new window