Financial history ST ANDREWS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1022398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £110.31k £123.43k £117.00k £115.88k £118.47k
Total expenditure £102.66k £105.76k £105.34k £104.37k £112.51k
Income from government contracts £82.92k N/A N/A N/A £90.96k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A