COLSTONS PARENTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1023308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 03 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required