Governing document MORLEY COLLEGE LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED 27 JUNE 2000 AND 10 DECEMBER 2007 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 AUG 2016 as amended on 04 Apr 2018 as amended on 15 Jul 2019 as amended on 28 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION TO PERSONS ("STUDENTS") OF COURSES AND SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS SHALL BE DETERMINED BY THE GOVERNING BODY OF THE COLLEGE TO MEET THE NEEDS OF ITS STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.