Trustees MORLEY COLLEGE LIMITED
Charity number: 1023523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisabeth Fullick | Chair | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jasmin Zoe Zapata Matas | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marshal Ngcongco | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymundo Zuniga Vega | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessie Dhaivanaighee Peramal | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melissa Score | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Neil Cole | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Alice Ryle | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Evans | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Hudson Ward | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gail Le Coz | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lindsey | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS ROY DURSTON | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Justine Brian | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Fry | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW GOWER | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR OLOWE | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.