ST MARYS TRUST

Charity number: 1023723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.19k £34.16k £6.96k £1.19k £744
Total expenditure £6.19k £25.69k £206 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A