Financial history 16TH HENDON (ST MARY MAGDALEN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1024030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.77k £8.99k £12.37k £8.99k £17.62k
Total expenditure £22.76k £5.79k £8.92k £7.88k £9.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k