RIVERHEAD INFANTS SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1024375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 11 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time Download