BASLOW WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1025013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 14 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required