Financial history HINDU CULTURAL RESOURCE CENTRE SANDWELL

Charity number: 1025094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £170.90k £166.97k £192.94k £131.68k £91.44k
Total expenditure £128.38k £132.62k £163.43k £140.92k £94.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.86k £1.15k £1.26k £3.20k N/A