Trustees SKER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1025113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jaqueline Lewis | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Thomas | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
MURIEL STUBBS | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Joan Davies | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Wendy Williams | Trustee | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Coombs | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN JONES | Trustee | 09 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE GUTTRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET EUNICE HOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYNTHIA SIDEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.