BEAUMOND HOUSE COMMUNITY HOSPICE

Charity number: 1025442
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £932.36k £1.04m £982.65k £1.08m £1.32m
Total expenditure £1.12m £1.15m £1.10m £1.17m £1.25m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £320.53k £320.53k £403.47k £494.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £285.24k £261.84k £318.24k £321.29k £479.90k
Income - Other trading activities £323.21k £440.54k £320.28k £323.75k £323.73k
Income - Charitable activities £315.74k £320.53k £320.53k £403.46k £494.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.17k £8.92k £23.60k £29.09k £25.00k
Income - Other £0 £6.79k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £42.95k £9.13k £37.23k £40.10k £63.74k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £944.94k £898.87k £886.01k £930.23k £972.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £177.98k £253.49k £218.11k £243.66k £272.30k
Expenditure - Governance £137.07k £150.80k £118.32k £122.37k £132.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £5.23k £0 £0 £6.10k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0