Governance WICKS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1025460
Charity reporting is overdue by 168 days
Registration history:
  • 31 August 1993: Standard registration
  • 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 04 November 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 28 October 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property