THRIPLOW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1025531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 06 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 23 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 31 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 31 August 2016 On time Download