THRIPLOW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1025531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £113.75k £120.37k £134.12k £139.27k £140.17k
Total expenditure £152.41k £90.67k £131.95k £171.32k £163.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A