BIDBOROUGH CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1025911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 15 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 October 2019 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 October 2019 107 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required