BIDBOROUGH CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1025911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £20.55k £33.79k £36.28k £25.28k £19.92k
Total expenditure £16.75k £37.10k £38.76k £25.77k £8.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A