POCHIN SCHOOL BARKBY PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 23 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required