WILTSHIRE MUSIC CENTRE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1026160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £871.76k £916.01k £1.17m £1.00m £1.02m
Total expenditure £873.91k £955.28k £1.04m £1.19m £1.20m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £135.10k £131.75k £128.75k £123.33k £33.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £334.61k £262.71k £408.74k £353.11k £387.35k
Income - Other trading activities £148.95k £152.29k £135.99k £129.95k £133.88k
Income - Charitable activities £368.41k £475.86k £602.08k £477.67k £465.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.80k £25.14k £27.42k £43.67k £36.24k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £97.20k £0 £169.15k £139 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £830.30k £905.05k £986.27k £1.12m £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £43.61k £50.22k £53.17k £63.64k £61.28k
Expenditure - Governance £4.30k £5.02k £6.78k £6.74k £8.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £5.26k £6.53k £6.99k £6.92k £5.24k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0