THE JULIA MARGARET CAMERON TRUST

Charity number: 1026339
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019
Total gross income £113.98k £97.07k £126.80k £140.98k £145.19k
Total expenditure £133.53k £111.99k £123.56k £106.54k £106.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A