Financial history MEDECINS SANS FRONTIERES (UK)

Charity number: 1026588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £53.74m £57.23m £64.65m £72.68m £68.02m
Total expenditure £55.55m £56.60m £59.42m £69.39m £71.89m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £48.66m £52.73m £60.56m £68.23m £63.47m
Income - Other trading activities £51.08k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.88m £4.45m £3.99m £4.16m £4.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.97k £18.56k £34.83k £15.79k £8.02k
Income - Other £140.07k £21.70k £57.16k £272.25k £79.94k
Income - Legacies £7.57m £14.71m £20.10m £19.67m £12.31m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £48.50m £49.61m £52.07m £60.98m £62.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.05m £6.99m £7.35m £8.41m £9.61m
Expenditure - Governance £82.69k £91.53k £342.88k £107.02k £97.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £37.92m £38.13m £39.98m £49.21m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0