OGLESBY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1026669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 14 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 11 September 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 07 August 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 09 August 2018 10 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 30 May 2017 On time Download