OGLESBY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1026669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.05m £2.08m £2.39m £10.84m £598.66k
Total expenditure £2.68m £3.32m £3.64m £3.59m £3.53m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £869.18k £2.00m £2.31m £10.72m £417.20k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £167.33k £69.21k £78.72k £116.01k £172.37k
Income - Other £15.45k £3.75k £4.38k £4.38k £9.10k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.60m £3.32m £3.45m £3.59m £3.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.32k £90.22k £0 £4.80k £160.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.60m £3.23m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £80.23k £0 £186.59k £0 £0