CHISWICK PIER TRUST

Charity number: 1026957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £120.94k £163.84k £122.24k £134.70k £134.02k
Total expenditure £134.39k £161.26k £243.88k £157.66k £137.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A