FRIENDS OF RYELANDS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1027119
Charity reporting is overdue by 152 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £3.51k £7.96k £7.29k £9.99k £8.44k
Total expenditure £9.09k £7.54k £14.66k £5.69k £9.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A