Financial history CO OPEPYS COMMUNITY ARTS PROJECT

Charity number: 1027133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.61k £7.04k £3.54k £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.50k £2.86k £3.68k £246 £1.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A