LANCASHIRE COUNTY YOUTH CRICKET CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1027172
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3033 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2012 Overdue Overdue by 3033 days
Annual return 30 November 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3398 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2011 Overdue Overdue by 3398 days
Annual return 30 November 2010 09 June 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2010 09 June 2011 On time
Annual return 30 November 2009 19 May 2010 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2009 19 May 2010 On time
Annual return 30 November 2008 30 September 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2008 30 September 2009 On time