THE U3A CHELMSFORD

Charity number: 1027234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required