THE U3A CHELMSFORD

Charity number: 1027234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.32k £8.74k £24.23k £28.84k £33.38k
Total expenditure £9.39k £9.37k £21.66k £29.18k £30.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A