WEST LONDON CENTRE FOR COUNSELLING

Charity number: 1027290
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 March 2020 35 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 December 2016 On time Download