MARLBOROUGH GRANT MAINTAINED SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1027372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.57k £21.83k £21.49k £24.41k £21.73k
Total expenditure £7.47k £13.17k £20.11k £27.44k £25.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A