Financial history 7TH HUDDERSFIELD CLAYTON WEST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1027906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.32k £23.64k £18.59k £19.48k £14.90k
Total expenditure £11.42k £22.84k £17.95k £15.21k £9.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.00k N/A N/A N/A