Financial history PROVINCIAL GRAND CHARITY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND HUNTINGDONSHIRE

Charity number: 1028243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £252.26k £252.64k £117.58k £83.16k £203.47k
Total expenditure £229.57k £229.57k £122.39k £122.40k £142.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A