Accounts and annual returns WOOLMER GREEN AND OAKLANDS YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1028368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 July 2020 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required