Accounts and annual returns BOROUGH GREEN PARISH CHURCH HALL

Charity number: 1028484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 July 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required