Accounts and annual returns BARNHAM BROOM AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1029028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 26 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required