Financial history BARNHAM BROOM AND DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1029028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £2.45k £1.66k £1.73k £1.06k £985
Total expenditure £2.15k £1.77k £1.57k £861 £804
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A