Financial history ST THEODORE ECCLESIASTICAL TRUST

Charity number: 1029085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £60.15k £59.27k £65.66k £51.09k £57.93k
Total expenditure £54.39k £59.63k £59.88k £56.36k £66.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A