A M QATTAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1029450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.00m £16.46m £11.98m £13.94m £5.88m
Total expenditure £5.18m £5.44m £7.13m £7.04m £7.79m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £96.88k £112.61k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.22m £16.29m £10.61m £13.57m £5.59m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £40.10k £32.89k £69.98k £88.92k £88.07k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.66k £16 £109.40k £278.94k £200.44k
Income - Other £1.74m £136.29k £1.19m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £923 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.18m £4.23m £7.02m £7.01m £7.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £111.07k £26.94k £45.02k
Expenditure - Governance £25.32k £33.19k £16.74k £36.78k £26.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £465.37k £413.54k £1.29m £766.79k £1.02m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £111.07k £26.94k £45.02k
Expenditure - Other £0 £1.20m £0 £0 £0