A M QATTAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1029450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Khaled Fahmy Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
NADIA HIJAB Trustee 30 May 2013 None on record
OMAR AL-QATTAN Chair None on record
Dr Khalil Hindi Dr Trustee 29 June 2016 None on record
Dr NAJWA AL-QATTAN PHD Trustee None on record
Dr Mezna Qato Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Raif Zreik Trustee 14 May 2017 None on record
Abla Maayah Trustee 13 June 2014 None on record