Financial history PILGRIM HOSPITAL RADIO

Charity number: 1029633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.28k £5.89k £3.00k £1.54k £5.72k
Total expenditure £1.60k £4.84k £2.67k £1.27k £3.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A