FOWEY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1029712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £96.81k £99.33k £87.37k £124.44k £129.46k
Total expenditure £96.22k £88.45k £87.74k £116.25k £104.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A