Accounts and annual returns OAKS LADIES CLUB

Charity number: 1029932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required