Trustees NORTHERN NORWICH SCOUT DISTRICT
Charity number: 1029956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVILLE PETER JARVIS | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ronald Mobbs | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Barnett | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Alistair Killow | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anastasia Rosemary Killow | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Toby John Whitaker Hartley | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steven Cooke | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|||||
James Joseph Andrew Dearden | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Samuels | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Peter Page | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Wright | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.