ALL SAINTS NURSERY, WINFARTHING

Charity number: 1030326
Charity reporting is overdue by 1574 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 01 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 478 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 478 days
Annual return 01 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 844 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 844 days
Annual return 01 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1209 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1209 days
Annual return 01 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1574 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1574 days