Financial history FRIENDS OF PRIORY JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/09/2017 21/09/2018 21/09/2019 21/09/2020 21/09/2021
Total gross income £12.47k £10.91k £12.31k £3.59k £12.72k
Total expenditure £6.45k £5.20k £4.08k £18.85k £6.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A