Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ALDE VALLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1030904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.26k £605 £3.69k £444 £0
Total expenditure £753 £287 £533 £4.44k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A