Dogfen lywodraethu HARTLEPOOL SPECIAL NEEDS SUPPORT GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 JUL 1990 AS AMENDED ON 22 NOV 1993 AS AMENDED ON 08 NOV 1999 AS AMENDED ON 04 JUN 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 MAY 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION YOUNG PEOPLE WITH PROFOUND PHYSICAL/LEARNING DISABILITIES, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE CONCERNING THE NEEDS OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE (B) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE HAVING NEED OF THOSE FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITIES, SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Maes buddion
IN PRACTICE THE BOROUGH OF HARTLEPOOL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.