SHERBORNE IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1031238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £431 £20.43k £20.56k £29.44k £23.77k
Total expenditure £22.15k £32.95k £1.04k £14.50k £21.81k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A