SHERBORNE IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1031238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angus Cater MA Trustee 11 March 2008
THE SCHOOL FEES CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Nicholas Ian Gavin-Brown Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
Alison Nurton Trustee 13 March 2018 None on record
MR RUPERT REED Trustee None on record
ROGER WATKINS Trustee None on record
James McKillop Trustee 20 April 2018 None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN WARE Trustee None on record
Graham Shaw Trustee 06 October 2015 None on record
JAMES NURTON Chair 12 March 2018 None on record